Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 02/27/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/01/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/09/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/09/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/08/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 05/08/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 05/09/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/09/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/19/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/19/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/28/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/28/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/28/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/29/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/29/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 05/30/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/30/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/11/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/11/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/11/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/11/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/18/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/22/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/22/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 07/22/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/22/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/22/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/24/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/24/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/29/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/29/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/29/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/08/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/11/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/11/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/11/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/11/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/11/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 09/15/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/15/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/15/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 09/15/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/18/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/18/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/18/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/18/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/04/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/04/2014