Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 12/16/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 01/14/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/29/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/26/2014