Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/04/2014