Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/07/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/07/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 01/13/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 01/13/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/30/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/30/2014