Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 12/12/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/05/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/14/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/14/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/04/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/04/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/04/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/29/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/29/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/29/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/29/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/29/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/29/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/29/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/29/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/29/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/29/2014