Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/09/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/09/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 01/09/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 01/09/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/09/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/09/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/09/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 01/09/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/10/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/10/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/10/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 01/10/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/10/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/10/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/10/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/10/2014
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/10/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 01/10/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/10/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/13/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/16/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/16/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/16/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/17/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/17/2014
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/21/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/29/2014
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/06/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/06/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/21/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/15/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/28/2014