Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/10/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 01/10/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/10/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/21/2014