Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/09/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/09/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/09/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/09/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/10/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/10/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/10/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/10/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/10/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/12/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/28/2014