There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Child CARE Act
Child Care Access and Refundability Expansion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to make the credit for dependent care expenses refundable and to index the income phaseout of the credit for inflation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/12/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
12/12/2013Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/12/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 12/12/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/13/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/15/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/27/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/28/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/03/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/03/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/28/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/28/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/14/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/14/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/14/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/14/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/14/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/24/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/24/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 04/04/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/10/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/21/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/29/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/10/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/18/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/12/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means12/12/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3740.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3740. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/12/2013)

Child Care Access and Refundability Expansion Act or the Child CARE Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax credit for dependent care expenses, to: (1) make such credit refundable, (2) deny such credit to nonresident aliens, and (3) allow an annual cost-of-living adjustment after 2013 to the amounts used to determine an income-based reduction in the amount of such credit.