Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 12/12/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/13/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/15/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/27/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/28/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/03/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 02/03/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/10/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/28/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 02/28/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/14/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/14/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/14/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 03/14/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 03/14/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/14/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/24/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/24/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 04/04/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/10/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 05/21/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/29/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/10/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/18/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/10/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/12/2014