Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 03/24/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/24/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/24/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/08/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/28/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/09/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/10/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/15/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/17/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/22/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/29/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/30/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/08/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/09/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/11/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/11/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/15/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/15/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/16/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/16/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/16/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/16/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/16/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 11/12/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/19/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/20/2014