Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/16/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/16/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/16/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/16/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 12/16/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/16/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/16/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 12/16/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 12/16/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 12/16/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/16/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/19/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 12/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/19/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 01/07/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 01/07/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/27/2014