Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 12/12/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/07/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/09/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 01/31/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/03/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/06/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/25/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/04/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/10/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 03/21/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/24/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/30/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/02/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/02/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/02/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/06/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/07/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/08/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/13/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/15/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 05/15/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/15/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/09/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/20/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/20/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/23/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/25/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/28/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/17/2014