Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/13/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/08/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 07/11/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/09/2014