Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/05/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 02/05/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/05/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/05/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/05/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/15/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/15/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/15/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/15/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 02/27/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/18/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/16/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/13/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/13/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/28/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 02/06/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/09/2014