Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/18/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/04/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/04/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 12/04/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/09/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/09/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/11/2014