Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 02/01/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/27/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/11/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 04/18/2013