Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 02/04/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/14/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/27/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/12/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/12/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 04/18/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 04/18/2013