There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Philippines Charitable Giving Assistance Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Philippines Charitable Giving Assistance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Philippines Charitable Giving Assistance Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Philippines Charitable Giving Assistance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To accelerate the income tax benefits for charitable cash contributions for the relief of victims of the Typhoon Haiyan in the Philippines.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
03/25/2014Became Public Law No: 113-92. (TXT | PDF)
03/25/2014Signed by President.
03/25/2014Presented to President.
03/25/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed, pursuant to the order of March 6, 2014, without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1706)
03/24/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H2575)
12/12/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
03/25/2014Became Public Law No: 113-92. (TXT | PDF)
03/25/2014Signed by President.
03/25/2014HousePresented to President.
03/25/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/25/2014SenateSee also S. 1821.
03/25/2014SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed, pursuant to the order of March 6, 2014, without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1706)
03/24/2014-5:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2575)
03/24/2014-4:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3771.
03/24/2014-4:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2575-2577)
03/24/2014-4:57pmHouseMr. Kelly (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/12/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/12/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/12/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
12/12/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/16/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/16/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 01/16/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/16/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/16/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/05/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/05/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 02/05/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 02/05/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 02/05/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/05/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/11/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/28/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/28/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/24/2014

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means12/12/2013 Referred to
House Budget12/12/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3771. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-92 (03/25/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on March 24, 2014. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Philippines Charitable Giving Assistance Act - Treats cash contributions made after the enactment of this Act and before April 15, 2014, for the relief of victims in areas affected by Typhoon Haiyan as having been made on December 31, 2013, for purposes of the tax deduction for charitable contributions. Deems such a contribution as meeting the recordkeeping requirements of the Internal Revenue Code if the taxpayer produces a telephone bill showing the name of the donee organization and the date and amount of the contribution.