Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 12/12/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/16/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/16/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/16/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 01/16/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/16/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/16/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/05/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/05/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 02/05/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 02/05/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 02/05/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/05/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/11/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/28/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/28/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/24/2014