Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/18/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/17/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/17/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/26/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/30/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 07/22/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/23/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/25/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/28/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/29/2014