Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/13/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/10/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 07/25/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 09/18/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/11/2014