Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/23/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/23/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/23/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/23/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/03/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 01/08/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 01/08/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/10/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/10/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 01/13/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 01/15/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/16/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/31/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 02/10/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 02/11/2014