There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to exempt the retired pay of certain disabled veterans from the reduced adjustment of retired pay and retainer pay amounts for retired members of the Armed Forces under age 62, to prevent any adverse impact of the reduced adjustment on annuities under the Survivor Benefit Plan based on retired or retainer pay, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/19/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/24/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
12/19/2013Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/19/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (150)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 12/19/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/23/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/23/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/23/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/23/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/23/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/23/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/23/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/03/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/07/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/07/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/07/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/08/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/08/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/10/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/10/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/03/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services12/19/2013 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel01/24/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3789.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3789. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/19/2013)

Exempts from the reduction in the cost-of-living adjustment of retired pay of members of the Armed Forces under the age of 62 enacted by the Bipartisan Budget Act of 2013 the retired pay of any member or former member who is: (1) retired, (2) eligible for combat-related special compensation, or (3) entitled to concurrent payment of retired pay and veterans' disability compensation. Makes such reduction in the cost-of-living adjustment inapplicable to percentage increases allowed for annuities under survivor benefit plans based on retired or retainer pay.