Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 12/23/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/23/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/23/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 12/23/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/23/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/03/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/07/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/07/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/08/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 01/08/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/08/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/10/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/10/2014