Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 12/19/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/23/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 12/23/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/23/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 12/23/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/03/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/07/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/03/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/03/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/04/2014