Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 12/19/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 12/19/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/26/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/26/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 12/26/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/26/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/26/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/26/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/03/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/03/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/07/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/08/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/14/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/21/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/27/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/19/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/19/2014