Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/18/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/11/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/11/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/12/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/12/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/15/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/15/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/15/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/24/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/25/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/28/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/25/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/09/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/30/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/16/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 01/16/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 01/29/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/29/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/28/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/28/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/11/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/11/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 03/11/2014