Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/13/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/13/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/13/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/15/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/15/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 01/15/2014
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/15/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/27/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/27/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/27/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/14/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/28/2014
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/28/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/28/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/28/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/28/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 02/28/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/28/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 02/28/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/28/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/28/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/28/2014
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/28/2014