Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 01/23/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/13/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/13/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 02/26/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/06/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/19/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 12/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 12/10/2014