Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/05/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/02/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/08/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/28/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/29/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/20/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 06/05/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 06/17/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/10/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/16/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 07/22/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 08/01/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 09/08/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/10/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/16/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/12/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 12/02/2014