Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/09/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/09/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/26/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 02/26/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/26/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/13/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/25/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/25/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/25/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/01/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/01/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/01/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/01/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/02/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/02/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/02/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/02/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/02/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/02/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/02/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/03/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/03/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/03/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/08/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/08/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/08/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/08/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/09/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/09/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/28/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/30/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/06/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/20/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/20/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/22/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/22/2014
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/22/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/22/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 05/22/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/22/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 05/22/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/22/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/22/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/22/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/22/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/22/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/22/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/22/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/22/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/22/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/22/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/22/2014
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/22/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 05/22/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/22/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/22/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/22/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/22/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/22/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/22/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/22/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/22/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 05/28/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/28/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 06/12/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/17/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/17/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/13/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/13/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 11/13/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 11/13/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/13/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 11/13/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/13/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 11/13/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 11/13/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/13/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 11/13/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/13/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 11/13/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/13/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/13/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 11/13/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/17/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 11/17/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/17/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 11/17/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/03/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 12/03/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/03/2014