There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

BRIDGE Act of 2013
Building and Repairing Infrastructure with Domestic Gains in Employment Act of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Transportation to establish a grant program to assist the repair and replacement of bridges, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/09/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
01/10/2014Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/09/2014Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/09/2014Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/12/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/17/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/11/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/09/2014 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit01/10/2014 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3839.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3839. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/09/2014)

Building and Repairing Infrastructure with Domestic Gains in Employment Act of 2013 or BRIDGE Act of 2013 - Authorizes the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to make competitive grants to states for projects to repair or replace a bridge.

Requires the Secretary in awarding such grants to give preference to projects that: (1) address bridges with a demonstrated significant need for repair or replacement, and (2) create a significant number of jobs.

Sets the federal share of project costs at 80%.