Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/13/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/13/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/25/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/30/2014