Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/10/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/10/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/25/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/25/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/02/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/29/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/30/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/22/2014