Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/10/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 01/10/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/10/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/10/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/10/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/14/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/25/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 03/25/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/26/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/27/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/27/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/27/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 04/02/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/02/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/09/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 05/19/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/29/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/29/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/30/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/29/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/30/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/18/2014