Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 01/14/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 01/16/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 01/17/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 01/28/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/10/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/10/2014