Text: H.R.3856 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/13/2014)


113th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 3856


To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide a 2-year extension of the exclusion from gross income for the discharge of qualified principal residence indebtedness, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

January 13, 2014

Mr. Foster introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means


A BILL

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide a 2-year extension of the exclusion from gross income for the discharge of qualified principal residence indebtedness, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Homeowners Debt Relief Extension Act of 2014”.

SEC. 2. Extension of exclusion from gross income of discharge of qualified principal residence indebtedness.

(a) In general.—Subparagraph (E) of section 108(a)(1) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking “January 1, 2014” and inserting “January 1, 2016”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendment made by this section shall apply to indebtedness discharged after December 31, 2013.

SEC. 3. Limitation on section 199 deduction attributable to oil, natural gas, or primary products thereof.

(a) Denial of deduction.—Paragraph (4) of section 199(c) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by adding at the end the following new subparagraph:

“(E) SPECIAL RULE FOR CERTAIN OIL AND GAS INCOME.—In the case of any taxpayer who is a major integrated oil company (as defined in section 167(h)(5)(B)) for the taxable year, the term ‘domestic production gross receipts’ shall not include gross receipts from the production, transportation, or distribution of oil, natural gas, or any primary product (within the meaning of subsection (d)(9)) thereof.”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendment made by subsection (a) shall apply to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2013.

SEC. 4. Debt reduction.

The net amount of any savings realized as a result of the enactment of this Act and the amendments made by this Act shall be deposited in the Treasury of the United States and used only to redeem outstanding Federal debt.