Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/26/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/12/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/09/2014