Text: H.R.3865 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (03/03/2014)

Calendar No. 313

113th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 3865


To prohibit the Internal Revenue Service from modifying the standard for determining whether an organization is operated exclusively for the promotion of social welfare for purposes of section 501(c)(4) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

February 27, 2014

Received; read the first time

March 3, 2014

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To prohibit the Internal Revenue Service from modifying the standard for determining whether an organization is operated exclusively for the promotion of social welfare for purposes of section 501(c)(4) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Stop Targeting of Political Beliefs by the IRS Act of 2014”.

SEC. 2. Applicable standard for determinations of whether an organization is operated exclusively for the promotion of social welfare.

(a) In general.—The standard and definitions as in effect on January 1, 2010, which are used to determine whether an organization is operated exclusively for the promotion of social welfare for purposes of section 501(c)(4) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 shall apply for purposes of determining the status of organizations under section 501(c)(4) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 after the date of the enactment of this Act.

(b) Prohibition on modification of standard.—The Secretary of the Treasury may not (nor may any delegate of such Secretary) issue, revise, or finalize any regulation (including the proposed regulations published at 78 Fed. Reg. 71535 (November 29, 2013)), revenue ruling, or other guidance not limited to a particular taxpayer relating to the standard and definitions specified in subsection (a).

(c) Application to organizations.—Except as provided in subsection (d), this section shall apply with respect to any organization claiming tax exempt status under section 501(c)(4) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 which was created on, before, or after the date of the enactment of this Act.

(d) Sunset.—This section shall not apply after the one-year period beginning on the date of the enactment of this Act.

Passed the House of Representatives February 26, 2014.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 313

113th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 3865

AN ACT
To prohibit the Internal Revenue Service from modifying the standard for determining whether an organization is operated exclusively for the promotion of social welfare for purposes of section 501(c)(4) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986.

March 3, 2014
Read the second time and placed on the calendar