Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/14/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 01/14/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 01/17/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/17/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 01/17/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/17/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 01/17/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/17/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 01/17/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 01/17/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/17/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 01/17/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/17/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 01/17/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/28/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/28/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/28/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/28/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/28/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 01/28/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 02/05/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/05/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 02/05/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/05/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 02/05/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/11/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/11/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/11/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/11/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/12/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/12/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/12/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 03/12/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/12/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/12/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 03/13/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/13/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/13/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 03/13/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 03/13/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/02/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/02/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/15/2014