Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/15/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/15/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/15/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/31/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/11/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/21/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/26/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/04/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 03/10/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/10/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/21/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/21/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/26/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/28/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/28/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/29/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/29/2014
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/01/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/06/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/08/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 05/13/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/19/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/19/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/21/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/27/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/28/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 05/28/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/29/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/30/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/05/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 06/05/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/09/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/09/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/12/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 06/17/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/19/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/19/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/23/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/09/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/14/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 07/24/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 07/29/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/08/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/08/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/08/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/08/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 09/08/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/10/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/11/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/11/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/15/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 09/15/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/15/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/15/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 09/15/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/16/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/16/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/17/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/18/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 09/19/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 11/13/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 11/13/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/17/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/17/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/18/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/19/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/01/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/11/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/11/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 12/11/2014