Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 01/15/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/15/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/15/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/03/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/27/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/10/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/18/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/08/2014