Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/18/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/18/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/21/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/06/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 05/06/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/08/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/19/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/19/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/19/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/21/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/21/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/09/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/19/2014