Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/06/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 03/06/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/10/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/14/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 03/21/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/02/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 04/03/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/03/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/07/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/07/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/10/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/10/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 04/28/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/29/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/30/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 04/30/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 05/02/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/02/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/19/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 05/19/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/20/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 05/21/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/26/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/29/2014