Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 01/28/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 02/05/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/05/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/21/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/12/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/13/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 05/07/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 05/28/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 07/08/2014