Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 01/28/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/04/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/21/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/21/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/27/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 02/28/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/04/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/07/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/28/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/07/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 05/09/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 11/17/2014