Refine your search

Refined by:

Michigan Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 02/03/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/21/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/10/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/07/2014