Refine your search

Refined by:

Minnesota Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/28/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/05/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/28/2014