Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/28/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/20/2014